McDonald v. Gray et al

Plaintiff: Nathaniel McDonald
Defendant: Wayne Gray, Chandra Johnson and David Kervin
Case Number: 1:2009cv00056
Filed: February 2, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Chandra Johnson, David Kervin, Wayne Gray stating it is recommended that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED, that this action be DISMISSED with prejudice, and that judgment be entered in favor of all Defendants and against Plaintiff on all claims. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/7/10. copies to parties. (sdb)
November 6, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court Order entered that this action is before the Court for screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B).In order for plaintiffs amended complaint to be properly screened, additional information is needed. Plaintiff is therefore ORDERED by 12/7/09 to file a copy of the disciplinary report for the disciplinary about which he complains and the corresponding incident report. Information concerning the wardens reversal is ORDERED to be included in this information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/6/09. (mca)
February 27, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 1 Complaint filed by Nathaniel McDonald. The complaint is not on the court's form. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 3/27/2009 for plaintiff to file new form 1983.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/27/09. (order and 1983 form to plaintiff) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Gray et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandra Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kervin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?