Sheffield v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Joseph M. Sheffield
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation and Prestige Title Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00061
Filed: February 5, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 15:1601 Truth in Lending

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation against Joseph M. Sheffield. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/12/09. (copy mailed) (cmj)
September 15, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Defendant FDIC/Franklin Bank; granting 14 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Defendant Prestige Title Co.; finding as moot 19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/15/09. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
September 1, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Order entered that in light of the citizenship of Defendant Prestige Title Company, Inc. is unclear and because this issue has not been addressed by the Defendant FDIC/Franklin Bank, it is hereby ORDERED the Defendant FDIC/Franklin Bank shall file a supplemental brief no later than September 8, 2009, regarding the applicability of Sections 1819(b)(2)(D) and (E) as well as provide the appropriate factual information regarding the citizenship of the Defendant Prestige Title Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/1/09. (mca)
March 31, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court Order entered. Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2009 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3B, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling Jr. If Plaintiff no longer wishes to proceed with this action, he is ordered to inform the Court of that fact no later than 4/10/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 3/30/09. (copy of order to pro se plaintiff) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheffield v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M. Sheffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Kirkland E. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Title Co., Inc.
Represented By: Chase R. Laurendine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?