Lay v. Hixon

Plaintiff: John Joshua Lay
Defendant: Scott D. Hixon
Case Number: 1:2009cv00075
Filed: February 17, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Marine Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1333 Admiralty

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2012 115 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on the non-jury trial held 8/27/2012. The Court finds that the vessel did not require rescuing from marine peril, and no prudent owner would have wanted or authorized a putative salvor to intervene in those circumstances. Accordingly, plaintiff shall have and recover nothing, and judgment will be entered infavor of defendants. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/29/2012. (tgw)
May 30, 2012 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Motions as set out - DENYING 86 Motion for Summary Judgment because the Court in its discretion finds that the equitable doctrine of judicial estoppel does not bar plaintiff from pursuing this salvage action; DENYING 91 Motion to Strike ; GRANTING 98 Motion for Leave to File; DENYING 99 Motion to Certify Question to Alabama Supreme Court. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/30/2012. Copies to counsel. (mpp)
June 8, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Motion for Entry of Default; denying 63 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 64 Motion for leave to Amend Pending Motion; granting 67 Motion for Leave to Submit Exhibit and the document appended thereto as Exhibit A has bee n duly considered. Defendants' counsel are directed to apprise their clients of the importance of keeping counsel informed of their current mailing address. Defendants are ordered to continue filing status reports concerning the stat court litigation every 60 days, with the next such report due on 8/1/11. The Status Reports (docs. 68, 69) filed by the parties on 5/31/11 are noted. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/8/2011. (mbp)
May 12, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 14 MOTION to Stay filed by Scott D. Hixon. This action is STAYED pending resolution of the Baldwin County Circuit Court criminal proceedings against John Joshua Lay. Hixson and Gulf Bay are ordered to file status reports every 60 days, with the first report to be due on or before June 1, 2009. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 5/12/09. (tgw)
March 26, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court Order DENYING 6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Scott D. Hixon. Answer to Amended Complaint due from Scott D. Hixon on 4/9/2009. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 3/26/09. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lay v. Hixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Joshua Lay
Represented By: Gregory C. Buffalow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott D. Hixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?