Buckhault v. United States of America

Petitioner: Clifton D. Buckhault
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2009cv00111
Filed: March 4, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Clifton D. Buckhault, recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) for failure to comply with the Court's order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/23/09. (mbp)
June 19, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Clifton D. Buckhault, recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) for failure to comply with the Court's order. Objections to R&R due by 7/16/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 6/18/09. (copy mailed) (cmj)
April 21, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for clerk to re-mail doc. 3 with appropriate forms. The time for complying with the Cour's Order dated 4/6/09 is extended to 5/8/09. Petitioner is to inform court by 5/8/09 if he wishes to proceed. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 5/8/2009.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 4/21/09. order, doc, 3, IFP and petition mailed to petitioner at new address. Address changed on docket sheet) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckhault v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clifton D. Buckhault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?