Shawnee Terminal Railroad Co., Inc. v. J.E. Estes Wood Co., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Shawnee Terminal Railroad Co., Inc.
Defendant: J.E. Estes Wood Co., Inc. and A.A. Nettles, Sr. Properties, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00113
Filed: March 4, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Torts to Land Office
County: Monroe
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2011 159 Opinion or Order of the Court Order entered that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE subject to the right of either party to reinstate the action within 30 days should the settlement not be consummated.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/3/2011. (cmj)
September 12, 2011 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 127 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/12/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
February 25, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 76 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 67 MOTION to Dismiss Count One of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by J.E. Estes Wood Co., Inc.. It is ordered that the Defendant J.E. Estes Wood Co. Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Count One (Doc. 67) is GRANTED and that Count One of the Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/25/2011. Copies to parties. (sdb)
December 15, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 65 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 24 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Or, in the Alternative, For Jurisdictional Discovery, is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/15/2010. (cmj)
November 23, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 24 Motion to Dismiss. It is RECOMMENDED that the defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Or, in the Alternative, For Jurisdictional Discovery, be DENIED, at this time. Objections to R&R due by 12/13/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/23/10. copies to parties. (sdb)
September 18, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered that in accordance with the Order issued on this date, the Magistrate Judges Supplemental Report and Recommendation (Doc. 38) is hereby ADOPTED, Defendants Motion to DISMISS (Doc. 24) is hereby GRANTED, and this case is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/18/09. (mca)
August 18, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, supplementing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 MOTION to Dismiss and 24 Motion to Dismiss, recommending this action be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction as set out. Objections to R&R due by 9/1/2009 Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/18/09. (cmj)
June 18, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 MOTION to Dismiss For Want of Jurisdiction and/or Stay Proceedings Pending Discovery on Diversity Jurisdiction filed by J.E. Estes Wood Co., Inc., Shawnee Terminal Railroad Co., Inc. and 6 MOTION to Dismiss For Want of Jurisdiction and/or Stay Proceedings Pending Discvoery on Diversity Jurisdiction filed by J.E. Estes Wood Co., Inc., A.A. Nettles, Sr. Properties, Ltd., recommending that defendants' motions to dismiss be granted. The parties' motions to file sur-reply briefs 15 are granted. Objections to R&R due by 7/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/18/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shawnee Terminal Railroad Co., Inc. v. J.E. Estes Wood Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawnee Terminal Railroad Co., Inc.
Represented By: Brian P. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.E. Estes Wood Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.A. Nettles, Sr. Properties, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?