Odom et al v. Southeast Supply Header, LLC

Plaintiff: Larry A. Odom, Sr. and Judy Odom
Defendant: Southeast Supply Header, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv00147
Filed: March 17, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2010 90 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Southeast Supply Header as to Count Two as set out. All other claims and causes of action brought by the parties herein are dismissedwith prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/29/10. Copies to parties on 4/30/10. (mpp)
January 14, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 68 Motion to Amend as set out. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 1/14/2010. Copies to parties on 1/15/2010. (mpp)
December 9, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. The remaining causes of action for trial are the portion of plaintiffs Count One (fraud) relating to misrepresentations about restoration of the right-of-way, and defendant's Count Three (abuse of process) against Larry Odom. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 12/9/09. (tgw)
June 11, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 6/11/09. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odom et al v. Southeast Supply Header, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry A. Odom, Sr.
Represented By: John W. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Odom
Represented By: John W. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Supply Header, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?