American National General Insurance Company v. Childers et al

Plaintiff: American National General Insurance Company
Defendant: Jonathan Brian Childers, James D. Bennett, Jr., Thomas W. Journell, Alan Wilson Moore, Roger Puterbaugh and Shirley Moore
Case Number: 1:2009cv00172
Filed: March 30, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plf's 76 Motion for Court to find that Service has been made on Defendant UnitedHealthcare Plan of the Valley, Inc. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/30/10. (tot)
December 23, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 37 motion to amend order of District Judge adopting Report and Recommendation and 39 motion to disburse interpleaded proceeds. Plaintiff's 37 Motion to Amend is GRANTED to the extent that the plaintiff will be allowed to amend t he complaint to add all known lienholders as additional defendants in this case. The court will refrain from distributing any funds to any defendants until the lienholders have had a chance to answer the complaint and assert their claims, if any, to the interpled funds. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file an amended complaint on or before January 8, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/23/2009. (mab)
October 2, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that the Motion for Default Judgment against Dft Jonathan Brian Childers is GRANTED, & Plf American National General Ins. Co. is discharged from further liability under the subject insurance policy by reason of the automobile accident as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/2/09. (copy mailed to Dft Childers on 10/2/09) (tot)
September 2, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Plf's 24 MOTION for Default Judgment against Dft Jonathan Brian Childers be GRANTED & that Plf be discharged from further liability under the subject policy as set out. Objections to R&R due by 9/17/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/2/09. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American National General Insurance Company v. Childers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American National General Insurance Company
Represented By: Sue E. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Brian Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Bennett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas W. Journell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Wilson Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Puterbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?