Gulf Coast Asphalt Company, L.L.C. v. Chevron U.S.A., Inc.

Plaintiff: Gulf Coast Asphalt Company, L.L.C.
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00187
Filed: April 6, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Environmental Matters Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Bert W. Milling
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:6901 Resource & Recovery Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2011 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiffs' 85 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs to the extent that Chevron is awarded a total of $875,626.64 for attorney's fees and $99,186.49 for costs. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/11/2011. (mab)
August 30, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that JUDGMENT be and is hereby entered in favor defendant, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., and against plaintiff, Gulf Coast Asphalt Company, L.L.C., and third-party defendant, Trifinery, Inc. as set out in judgment. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 08/30/2010. (mab)
April 6, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 65 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, and GRANTING 57 MOTION to Dismiss Trifinery, Inc.'s Counterclaims filed by Chevron U.S.A., Inc. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 04/06/2010. (mab)
August 17, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 46 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as the opinion of this Court. It is ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 21 ) be GRANTED and that Count II in the Complaint be DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 08/17/2009. (mab)
July 31, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, recommending that Defendant's 21 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of the Complaint be granted. Objections to R&R due by 8/14/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 07/31/2009. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulf Coast Asphalt Company, L.L.C. v. Chevron U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulf Coast Asphalt Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Russell Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?