QBE Insurance Corporation v. Dolphin Line, Inc.

Plaintiff: QBE Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Dolphin Line, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00190
Filed: April 7, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Dolphin Line, Inc.'s 15 MOTION to Dismiss QBE's Complaint is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/6/09. (tot)
August 11, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Dolphin Line, Inc.'s 15 MOTION to Dismiss QBE's Complaint be DENIED as set out. Objections to R&R due by 8/25/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/11/09. (tot)
June 17, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Dft's 13 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default. Dft is ORDERED to file its motion to dismiss referenced in the motion to set aside entry of default on or before 7/1/09. Plf's 7 Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/17/09. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QBE Insurance Corporation v. Dolphin Line, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QBE Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Jamie Austin Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolphin Line, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?