The Denny Manufacturing Co., Inc. v. Drops & Props, Inc.

Plaintiff: The Denny Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Defendant: Drops & Props, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00214
Filed: April 16, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Copyright Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:101 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING 107 request for a reasonable attorneys' fees, costs and expenses filed by The Denny Manufacturing Co., Inc.. Denny is awarded a reasonable attorneys' fee in the total amount of $34,934.50, and costs andexpenses in the amount of $3,472.14, for a total award of $38,406.64. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/1/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 17, 2011 106 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 87 MOTION for Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction filed by The Denny Manufacturing Co., Inc.. The court finds that DP is in civil contempt of the injunction as to some activities, as further set out. The Court awards Denn y reasonable attorney's fees for bringing this motion. Denny should submit by 4/7/2011, sufficient evidentiary support for the Court to determine both the reasonableness of the proffered hourly rate and whether the hours expended were reasonable. DP shall submit any response by 4/21/2011. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/17/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
January 7, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Jay Gupta, recommending that Defendant Gupta's Motion be denied in its entirety.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/6/2010. (cmj)
December 17, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Jay Gupta, recommending that Defendant Gupta's Motion be denied in its entirety. Objections to R&R due by 12/31/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 12/16/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Denny Manufacturing Co., Inc. v. Drops & Props, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Denny Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Represented By: Paul Matthew Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drops & Props, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?