Turquoise Properties Gulf, Inc. v. Iberiabank
Plaintiff: Turquoise Properties Gulf, Inc.
Defendant: Iberiabank
Case Number: 1:2009cv00272
Filed: May 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ADOPTING 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Iberiabank, recommending that defendant's motion to dismiss be DENIED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/21/09. (cmj)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Iberiabank, recommending that defendant's motion to dismiss be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 10/26/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/8/09. (cmj)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER as to the following motions: IberiaBanks motion to dismiss 6 is DENIED as moot; IberiaBanks motion to strike 16 is DENIED; IberiaBanks motion for permission to file reply 23 is MOOT - all as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/3/09. Copies to parties on 8/4/09. (mpp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turquoise Properties Gulf, Inc. v. Iberiabank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turquoise Properties Gulf, Inc.
Represented By: Mark H. Taupeka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iberiabank
Represented By: E. B. Peebles, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?