Harrison v. Culliver et al

Plaintiff: Jody O'Neil Harrison
Defendant: Grant Culliver, Sylvester Folks, Captain Craft, Lane Allen and Ms. Poindexter
Case Number: 1:2009cv00283
Filed: May 21, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 93 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's 92 Motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/3/2012. Clerk mailed Appellant this Order (sdb)
October 13, 2011 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 85 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/13/2011. (copy mailed) (cmj)
September 22, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 77 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is recommended that Defendants' 34 and 35 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted, that this action be dismissed with prejudice, and that judgment be entered in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff on all claims. It is further recommended that Plaintiff's pending motions (Docs. 36 , 37 , 70 , 75 ) be denied as MOOT. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/22/2011. (mbp)
December 21, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 62 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Dr. Hugh M. Hood, Donny Myers, Sylvia Hicks, and Debra Poindexter are DISMISSED without prejudice. It is ORDERED that said Defendants' motion for summary judgment is denied as MOOT. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/21/10. copies mailed. (sdb)
November 30, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's motion to dismiss Defendants Hood, Myers, Hicks, and Poindexter (Doc. 55 ) be granted and that Plaintiff's claims against these Defendants be dismissed without prejudice. It is furt her recommended that the motion for summary judgment of Defendants Hood, Myers, Hicks, and Poindexter (Docs. 23 , 24 ) be denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 12/20/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 11/30/10. copies to parties. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Culliver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody O'Neil Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Culliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvester Folks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Poindexter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?