United Bank v. M/V The Crown Royal et al

Plaintiff: United Bank
Defendant: M/V The Crown Royal, M/V Restless, Richard J. Allen, Sheri A. Allen and R & S, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv00294
Filed: May 28, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 46:741 Shipping
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of United Bank against R & S, LLC, Richard J. Allen, Sheri A. Allen in the amount of $310,093.96 inclusive of interest, attny's fees & court costs. Post-judgment interest shall accrue at the statutory rate of 0.27% per day as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/8/10. (tot)
September 24, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court DECREE ORDERING SALE OF VESSEL, that M/V CROWN ROYAL n/k/a SHRIMPY TALES be condemned & sold as set out, that venditioni exponas issue as set out, & the sale take place on 10/27/10 at noon after advertising notices are published as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/24/10. (copies mailed to Dfts Richard J. Allen & Sheri A. Allen on 9/24/10; 3 cert. copies to USM on 9/24/10) (tot) Modified on 9/24/2010 (tot).
August 10, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of United Bank against Richard J. Allen, Sheri A. Allen, R & S, LLC in the amount $277,920.57 w/post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.27% per day as set out. Costs are taxed against Dfts. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/10/10. (copies mailed to Richard J. Allen, Sheri A. Allen & R & S, LLC on 8/10/10) (tot)
May 5, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING Plf's 32 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Richard Allen, Sherri Allen and R&S, LLC. Plf is to file a proposed default judgment & e-mail a version to chambers as set out on or before 5/11/2010, & Plf is further to advise the court of its intent w/respect to the in rem vessels as set out NLT 5/11/2010. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/5/10. (copies mailed to Dfts Richard J. Allen, Sheri A. Allen & R&S, LLC on 5/5/10) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Bank v. M/V The Crown Royal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Bank
Represented By: Craig D. Olmstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V The Crown Royal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Restless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheri A. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & S, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?