Superior Energy Services, LLC v. Boconco, Inc.
Plaintiff: Superior Energy Services, LLC
Defendant: Boconco, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00321
Filed: June 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Marine-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order vacating 79 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment and vacating 80 Judgment as set out. ( Bench Trial set for 3/23/2011 08:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Judge Kristi K. DuBose., Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2011 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Judge's Chambers, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Judge Kristi K. DuBose.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/21/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Pretrial Order) (cmj)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 68 Boconco's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/12/2010. (cmj)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER ADOPTING 56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 33 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Boconco, Inc., recommending the motion be denied. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/13/2010. (cmj)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 33 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Boconco, Inc., recommending the motion be denied. Objections to R&R due by 4/12/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/26/2010. (cmj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Superior Energy Services, LLC v. Boconco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Superior Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth A. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boconco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?