Burrell v. Infirmary West

Plaintiff: Janice C. Burrell
Defendant: Infirmary West
Case Number: 1:2009cv00325
Filed: June 8, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:2000rt Job Discrimination/Retaliation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2011 101 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 100 Response (the Court construes it as a motion to reconsider) filed by Janice C. Burrell. Plaintiff's motion to reconsider is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/6/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 1, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION entered re 8 MOTION to Dismiss stating that pltf's Amended Complaint be allowed, that deft's motion to dismiss be GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part, and that pltf's claim alleging violations under Title 18 USC 241 and 242, Title 42 USC 1985(2) and (3), and the First, Fifth, and Fourteenth Amendments be dismissed. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/1/10. Copies to parties on 3/2/10. (mpp)
February 12, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION entered re 8 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Infirmary West. It is recommended that pltf's amended complaint be allowed, that deft's motion to dismiss be grant ed in part, and denied in part, and that pltf's claim alleging violations under Title 18 USC 241 and 242, Title 42 USC 1983(2) and (3), and the First, Fifth, and Fourteenth Amendments be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 2/26/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/11/2010. (mca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burrell v. Infirmary West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice C. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infirmary West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?