Adams Offshore, Ltd. v. Con-Dive, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Adams Offshore, Ltd.
Defendant: Con-Dive, LLC, Oceanografia S.A. C.V. and Osa International, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv00378
Filed: June 25, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Marine-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2012 326 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 323 Motion to post supersedeas bond; denying 324 Motion for Expedited Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/24/2012. (tgw)
May 17, 2011 311 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 251 Adams' motion to recover custodia legis costs. Blake is ordered to reimburse Adams the sum of $206,463.21. Cashman is to reimburse Adams the sum of $5,898.95. To the extent Adams seeks additional or differ ent relief, its motion is denied. No further order shall be forthcoming from the Court except upon application by any party for final judgment as prescribed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/16/2011. (mbp)
January 27, 2011 290 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND STIPULATION OF REMAINING CLAIMS entered granting the 289 Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal. McDermott's motion for voluntary dismissal, (Doc. 275), and the joint motion of McDermott, Cashman and Adams to dismi ss, (Doc. 287), are denied as moot. Blake's motion to enforce settlement, embedded request for attorneys fees (construed as a motion), and motion for leave to supplement, (Docs. 276, 286), are denied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/27/2011. (tgw)
November 3, 2010 271 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 253 Motion to Stay; denying 255 Motion to Stay; denying 256 Motion for Bond; denying 267 Motion for Bond. The stay imposed and extended by previous court orders, (Docs. 261, 269), is lifted. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/3/10. (tgw)
September 24, 2010 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as to the following Motions: DENYING Adam's Motion 163 for Order of Interlocutory Sale; Blake's Motion 175 to Dismiss Adams' attachment is DENIED AS MOOT; The Motions to Vacate 194 , 196 & 197 are GRANTED as set out. Blake's motion 225 to respond to demand for arbitration is DENIED AS MOOT. The appointment of Core Industries, Inc. as substitute custodian 81 is rescinded. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/24/10. Copies to parties. (mpp)
September 15, 2010 216 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 212 , 213 & 214 Motions for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Oceanografia S.A. C.V. OSA's Reply briefs are due by 9/17/2010. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/15/10. (tgw)
September 10, 2010 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 201 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/10/10. (mbp)
February 1, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 97 Motion for Interlocutory Sale; denying as moot 101 Motion to require filing of appraisal or other documents on which minimum sales price request is based; granting 107 Motion for leave to file sur-reply. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 2/1/10. (tgw)
December 2, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Renewed Motion to Seal Exhibits. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 12/2/09. (tgw)
September 14, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 13 MOTION to Intervene filed by McDermott Gulf Operating Company, Inc. McDermott is ordered by 9/21/2009 to file its claim in intervention. The plaintiff's motion to include as custodia legis and/or administrative fees its costs incurred in removing the Equipment from theVessel (Doc. 64) is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 9/14/09. (tgw)
June 26, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF MARITIME ATTACHMENT entered. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama issue a Writ of Maritime Attachment directing the United States Marshal to affect an attachment of the Satur ation & Air Diving Systems, currently installed on the M/V BOLD ENDURANCE on behalf of the Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that during the period of the attachment of the Saturation & Air Diving Systems, the M/V BOLD ENDURANCE will be permitted to perform her normal operations within the district. The United States Marshall shall be custodian of the attached property. The master and crew presently aboard the vessel will be permitted to remain aboard and to carry out their usual duties during the period of attachment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the vessel will be permitted to shift berths within the port of Mobile. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 6/26/09. (mca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams Offshore, Ltd. v. Con-Dive, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adams Offshore, Ltd.
Represented By: Mary Campbell Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Con-Dive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oceanografia S.A. C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osa International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?