Miller et al v. Eagle Tug Boat Companies

Plaintiff: Jerry Miller and Stanley W. Miller
Defendant: Eagle Tug Boat Companies
Case Number: 1:2009cv00401
Filed: July 1, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Eagle Tug Boat Companies against Jerry Miller, Stanley W. Miller. Plaintiffs claims against the defendant are hereby DISMISSED WITHPREJUDICE. Costs are to be taxed against the plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/26/2010. (copy to pltfs) (mab)
October 25, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendant's 32 & 39 Motions for Summary Judgment; and finding as moot defendant's 57 Motion to Strike and 58 Motion to Reschedule the pre-trial conference. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/25/2010. (mab)
December 8, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as the opinion of this Vourt, and DENYING 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eagle Tug Boat Companies be denied. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/08/2009. (copies to pltfs) (mab)
November 19, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, recommending 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eagle Tug Boat Companies be denied. Objections to R&R due by 12/4/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/19/2009. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Eagle Tug Boat Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Tug Boat Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?