Williams v. Aircraft Workers World Wide, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jada McCants Williams
Defendant: Aircraft Workers World Wide, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00411
Filed: July 8, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 45 Motion to Supplement the Record. This action is dismissed with prejudice. A separate judgment will enter. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/24/2011. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
July 22, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aircraft Workers World Wide, Inc. Answer to 2nd Amended Complaint due from Aircraft Workers World Wide, Inc. on 8/5/2010. Plaintiff's request (docs. 13, 22) for disqualification of defendant's counsel is denied for lack of a conflict of interest. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/22/10. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
May 24, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying the 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed and 16 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aircraft Workers World Wide, Inc. The 18 Response to Motion filed by Jada McCants Williams is stricken. Plaintiff is ordered to file her Second Amended Comp laint by 6/7/2010. Answer to Second Amended Complaint is due from Aircraft Workers World Wide, Inc. on 6/17/2010. Defendant's counsel is ordered by 6/7/2010 to submit a memorandum of law reciting the details of any representation of Williams he may have undertaken (as set out). Plaintiff's Response is due by 6/14/2010. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/24/10. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Aircraft Workers World Wide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jada McCants Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aircraft Workers World Wide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?