Robinson v. Giles

Petitioner: Charles Robinson
Respondent: J. C. Giles
Case Number: 1:2009cv00488
Filed: July 31, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS TO DENY 22 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/22/10. (jal) (Clerk mailed copy to Appellant, e-mailed to USCA).
March 1, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action bedismissed without prejudice due to Petitioner's failure to comply with 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b)(3)(A) and that Petitioner is not entitled to a certificate of appealability. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/1/10. Copy mailed to Petitioner. (tgw)
January 28, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The original Report and Recommendation (Doc. 15) has been amended to address the issue of certificate of appealability. It is recommended that the petition be dismissed as a successive petition under 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b)(3)(A) because the Court lacks jurisdiction to consider it. Objections to R&R due by 2/17/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/28/10. Copy mailed to Petitioner. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. C. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?