Wilson v. Brown

Plaintiff: Ann P. Wilson
Defendant: Mary D. Brown
Case Number: 1:2009cv00490
Filed: August 3, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Legal Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT that this action is DISMISSED w/o prejudice as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/18/10. (copy mailed to Plf & Dft on 2/19/10) (tot)
February 8, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mary D. Brown stating that defendant's motion to dismiss be GRANTED; Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/8/10. (mjn) (STRICKEN ON 2/18/10 - SEE DOC. 21 ) Modified on 2/19/2010 (tot).
January 20, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mary D. Brown stating that defendant's motion to dismiss be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 2/3/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/20/2010. Copies to parties. (mpp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?