Quale v. Unifund CCR Partners et al

Plaintiff: Dan J. Quale
Defendant: Unifund CCR Partners and National City Card Services
Case Number: 1:2009cv00519
Filed: August 12, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: parties' 42 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. This case is DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/11/10. (copy mailed to Plf on 5/11/10) (tot) Modified on 5/11/2010 (tot).
March 30, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 36 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, granting 24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by National City Card Services, and dismissing without prejudice plaintiff's complaint against National City Bank. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 03/30/2010. (copy to pltf) (mab)
January 27, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Counts Two & Three of Plf's Complaint are DISMISSED w/o prejudice as to Dft Unifund CCR Partners. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/27/10. (copy mailed to Plf on 1/28/10) (tot)
October 21, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Unifund CCR Partners be granted in part and denied in part as set out, and that Counts Two and Three of Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 11/4/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 10/21/2009. (copy to pltf) (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quale v. Unifund CCR Partners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan J. Quale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unifund CCR Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Card Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?