Nelson v. Whirlpool Corporation et al

Plaintiff: David H. Nelson
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation, Lowes Home Centers, Inc. and Clarke-Washington Electric Membership Corporation
Case Number: 1:2009cv00520
Filed: August 13, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Washington
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2011 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 145 Motion to to exclude the opinions andtestimony of Edward Joy. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/12/2011. (tgw)
January 26, 2011 140 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Clarke-Washington Electric Membership Corporation. All claims by the plaintiffs against Clarke are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/26/2011. (tgw)
August 4, 2010 107 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 47 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The embedded motion to remand is denied. Plaintiff is ordered by 8/6/2010 to file their second amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/4/10. (tgw)
January 11, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion for Appeal of Interlocutory Order. The motion is granted with respect to the Court's ruling on the amount in controversy and denied with respect to its ruling on fraudulent joinder. The Court will amend its order denying remand accordingly. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 1/11/10. (tgw)
December 2, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Order STRIKING the 22 Offer of Judgment filed by Whirlpool Corporation. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 12/2/09. (tgw)
November 13, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion to Remand to State Court as set out & granting 13 Motion for Leave to File. The plaintiffs' motion for an award of fees and expenses, (Doc. 7 at 13), is likewise denied. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 11/13/09. Copies to parties & publication. (mpp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Whirlpool Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David H. Nelson
Represented By: Robert D. Keahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Edward G. Bowron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Home Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Charles A. Stewart, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarke-Washington Electric Membership Corporation
Represented By: Joseph C. McCorquodale, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?