Williams v. Ferrell

Plaintiff: Billy Williams
Defendant: Warden Ferrell
Case Number: 1:2009cv00578
Filed: September 4, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing with prejudice this action for failure to prosecute and abide by the Court's orders. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/4/2012. (copy mailed to last known address) (cmj)
June 6, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 66 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 63 MOTION filed by Billy Williams. It is CERTIFIED that this appeal is not taken in good faith in that the plaintiff has failed to show that he has a nonfrivolous issue to be presented to the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals. Therefore, Williams' motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis 63 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/6/2011. Copies to parties, Appeals Clerk, USCA. (mpp)
April 1, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/1/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 24, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Order deeming 45 Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Billy Williams MOOT, as set out. (Williams to submit interrogatories no later than 4/3/2011 per doc. 47) Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/23/2011. (copy mailed) (cmj)
March 23, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/23/2011. (copy mailed to Williams) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?