Scott v. Correctional Medical Services et al

Plaintiff: Joe Henry Scott, III
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services and William Stucco
Case Number: 1:2009cv00607
Filed: September 17, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plf's 15 Motion to Alter & Amend Judgment as set out & MOOTING Plf's 14 Motion for Extension of Time, 14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/28/09. (copy mailed to Plf on 12/30/09) (tot)
December 11, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that this action is DISMISSED w/prejudice, prior to service of process, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/11/09. (copy mailed to Plf & to Commissioner of ADOC on 12/14/09) (tot)
November 17, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this action be dismissed w/prejudice, prior to service of process, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Objections to R&R due by 12/8/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/17/09. (copy to Plf on 11/18/09) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Correctional Medical Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Henry Scott, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Stucco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?