Scott v. J.O. Davis Correctional Facility et al

Plaintiff: Joe Henry Scott, III
Defendant: J.O. Davis Correctional Facility, Walter Myers, Jerry Ferrell and Sandra Boggan
Case Number: 1:2009cv00610
Filed: September 17, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/6/10. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
February 17, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for a Restraining Order (Doc. 6) be and is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 2/17/10. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
January 20, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 6 MOTION for restraining order filed by Joe Henry Scott, III. It is recommended that the motion be denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 2/3/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/20/10. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. J.O. Davis Correctional Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Henry Scott, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.O. Davis Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Boggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?