Smith v. Baldwin County Commission

Plaintiff: Diane Smith
Defendant: Baldwin County Commission
Case Number: 1:2009cv00616
Filed: September 21, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000rt Job Discrimination/Retaliation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING all claims W/PREJUDICE subject to the right of any party to reinstate these claims w/i 30 days of the date of this order should the settlement agreement not be consummated. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/4/2011. (tot)
June 25, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending Dft's 21 MOTION for Partial Dismissal be granted as to Plf's claims for punitive damages, but denied as to Smith's claim for retaliation. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/25/10. (sdb)
May 26, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Dft's 35 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment as set out. The 33 Order dated 5/11/10 is SET ASIDE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to reinstate the 28 R&R of the Mag. Judge as well as the 21 Motion to Dismiss. Any objection to the R&R is to be filed by Plf NLT 6/9/10. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/26/10. (tot)
May 11, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE w/o prejudice for failure to prosecute & comply w/this court's orders as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/11/10. (copy mailed to Plf on 5/12/10) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Baldwin County Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Smith
Represented By: E. Barry Johnson Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baldwin County Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?