May v. Mobile County Public School System et al
Plaintiff: Roberta May
Defendant: Mobile County Public School System, Dr. Roy Nichols, Mobile County Public School System School Board, Mary Wood and Dr. Erica King
Case Number: 1:2009cv00625
Filed: September 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Counts 1-3 of Plaintiff's Complaint (the federal law claims) be and are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice and that Counts 4-6 of Plaintiffs Complaint (the state law claims) be and are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/4/10. (tgw)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADOPTING the #15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is ORDERED that Counts 1-3 of Plaintiff's Complaint (the federal law claims) be and are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice and that Counts 4-6 of Plaintiffs Complaint (the state law claims) be and are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/4/10. (tgw)
July 13, 2010 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Roberta May. It is recommended that Defendants' motions to dismiss be granted (Docs. 4, 10), that Plaintiff's federal law claims (Counts 1-3 of the complaint) be dismissed with prejudice, and that Plaintiff's state law claims (Counts 4-6 of the complaint) be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 7/27/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/13/10. (tgw)
July 12, 2010 Filing 14 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady and is now assigned to the docket of Chief Judge William H. Steele. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-C after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
May 7, 2010 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #12 Order to Show Cause, filed by Roberta May. (Parks, Melinda)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, on or before May 7, 2010, why this action should not be dismissed as barred by the statute of limitations. Failure to respond to this Order will result in a recommendation of dismissal of this action with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/19/10. (eec)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mary Wood; Responses due by 2/18/2010 Replies due by 2/25/2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 2/5/10. (mjn)
January 29, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Mary Wood. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Breif In Support of Motion To Dismiss) (Carbo, K.)
January 22, 2010 Filing 9 REPLY Brief filed by Defendants Mobile County Public School System, Mobile County Public School System School Board, Roy Nichols re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mobile County Public School System, Mobile County Public School System School Board, Roy Nichols. (Carbo, K.)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Roy Nichols, Mobile County Public School System, Mobile County Public School System School Board, ( Response to Motion due by 1/19/2010, Replies due by 1/26/2010., Motion to be taken under submission on 1/27/2010.). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/11/10. (eec)
January 11, 2010 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Roberta May. (Parks, Melinda)
December 31, 2009 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by K. Paul Carbo, Jr on behalf of Mary Wood (Carbo, K.)
December 23, 2009 Filing 5 Brief re #4 MOTION to Dismiss. (Carbo, K.)
December 23, 2009 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Mobile County Public School System, Mobile County Public School System School Board, Roy Nichols. (Carbo, K.)
November 16, 2009 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by K. Paul Carbo, Jr on behalf of Mobile County Public School System, Roy Nichols, Mobile County Public School System School Board (Carbo, K.)
September 29, 2009 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
September 28, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Receipt number 46031015705, Fee Paid at Intake), filed by Roberta May. (Parks, Melinda) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2009: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eec).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: May v. Mobile County Public School System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta May
Represented By: Melinda J. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile County Public School System
Represented By: K. Paul Carbo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Roy Nichols
Represented By: K. Paul Carbo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile County Public School System School Board
Represented By: K. Paul Carbo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Wood
Represented By: K. Paul Carbo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Erica King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?