Ceres Environmental Services, Inc. v. Colonel McCrary Trucking, LLC
Plaintiff: Ceres Environmental Services, Inc.
Defendant: Colonel McCrary Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv00642
Filed: September 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 FINAL JUDGMENT entered that the plaintiff shall have and recover from the defendant the sum of $4,018,293.16. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff Ceres Environmental Services, Inc. and against defendant Colonel McCrary Trucking, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/17/2011. (mbp)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order: The Court concludes that Ceres is entitled to contractual indemnity from McCrary for the $2.9 million paid in settlement of the Suit. Ceres is ordered by 3/10/2011 to file a supplemental brief regarding recovery of attorney's fee and costs. Responses due by 3/21/2011 & Replies due by 3/28/2011. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/24/2011. (tgw)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 42 Motion to Continue Trial as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/1/10. (sdb)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 22 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/2/10. (tgw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ceres Environmental Services, Inc. v. Colonel McCrary Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ceres Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Charles William Daniels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonel McCrary Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Cooper C. Thurber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?