Franklin v. Apple, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Clyde Bernard Franklin
Defendant: Apple, Inc. and AT&T Mobility, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00704
Filed: October 28, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2010 12 Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Eastern District of Louisiana requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District consisting of Docs. 1- 12 (eec)
December 23, 2009 Answer due from AT&T Mobility, L.L.C. on 2/5/2010; Apple, Inc. on 2/5/2010. (eec)
December 23, 2009 11 Featured Case ORDER entered re 10 Motion for Extension of Time. The unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond filed by the defendants is GRANTED. The defendants are ORDERED to answer or otherwise respond on or before February 5, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 12/23/09. (eec)
December 23, 2009 10 MOTION for Extension of Time by AT&T Mobility, L.L.C., Apple, Inc.. (Ford, Sara)
December 17, 2009 9 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation (Ford, Sara)
November 20, 2009 8 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, adjudged and decreed that counselor Max Coleman Marx, as a member in good standing of the Bar of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana, who has complied with the rules of this Court, be and is hereby admitted pro hac vice to serve the interests of justice in the above-entitled cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 11-20-09. (Cassady, William)
November 12, 2009 7 MOTION for Max C. Marx to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 11280000000000856281, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Clyde Bernard Franklin. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Application for Admission, # 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Marx, Max)
November 3, 2009 6 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, adjudged and decreed that counselor Ronnie G. Penton, as a member in good standing of the Bar of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana, who has complied with the rules of this Court, be and is hereby admitted pro hac vice to serve the interests of justice in the above-entitled cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 11/3/09. (Cassady, William)
October 29, 2009 Remark: Summons mailed to counsel for issuance. (eec)
October 29, 2009 5 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc., AT&T Mobility, L.L.C. (eec)
October 29, 2009 4 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
October 28, 2009 3 MOTION for Ronnie G. Penton to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 11280000000000850900, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Clyde Bernard Franklin. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Application for Admission, # 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Penton, Ronnie)
October 28, 2009 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Clyde Bernard Franklin to AT&T Mobility, L.L.C. and Apple, Inc. (Penton, Ronnie)
October 28, 2009 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 11280000000000850736, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Clyde Bernard Franklin. (Penton, Ronnie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2009: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eec).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Bernard Franklin
Represented By: Ronnie G. Penton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?