Terry et al v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Terry and Jonah Terry
Defendant: Grover Smith, Bruce Shue, John T. Moore, Stephen M. Billy, J. David Jordan, Arthur Mothershed and Larry Hammonds
Case Number: 1:2009cv00722
Filed: November 3, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2012 132 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER (amending 130 Order), 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Dfts Grover Smith & Bruce Shue is GRANTED as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/6/2012. (tot)
August 9, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 84 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Joseph Terry, Jonah Terry (the Court construes as a motion for additional time to respond to the report and recommendation.) Objections to R&R due by 10/11/2011. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/9/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
May 16, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/6/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/16/2011. (sdb)
September 14, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 27 MOTION to Dismiss. The motion to dismiss filed by defendants' Judge J. David Jordan and District Attorney Stephen Billy is GRANTED and all claims against these defendants are DISMISSED with PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/14/10. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Terry
Represented By: Russell J. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonah Terry
Represented By: Russell J. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grover Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Shue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen M. Billy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. David Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Mothershed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Hammonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?