Todd v. Alabama Power et al

Plaintiff: Hunter L. Todd
Defendant: Alabama Power, Craig Field Industrial Authority and South Dallas Water Department
Case Number: 1:2009cv00746
Filed: November 13, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For reasons as set out, the pleading (Doc. 22 ), construed as a motion to extend the time for filing a notice of appeal or as a motion to reopen the time to appeal, is denied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/10/10. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (tgw)
March 1, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action be and is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice, prior to service of process, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/1/10. Copy mailed to Plaintiff (tgw)
February 2, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS entered. It is recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice, prior to service of process, for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Given this recommendation and the reasons set forth herein, the grant of in forma pauperis status is hereby REVOKED. Objections to R&R due by 2/16/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/2/10. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd v. Alabama Power et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter L. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Field Industrial Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Dallas Water Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?