PNCEF, LLC v. Hendricks Building Supply, LLC et al

Plaintiff: PNCEF, LLC
Defendant: Hendricks Building Supply, LLC and Hendricks Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00801
Filed: December 9, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion for Default Judgment & 24 Supplemental Motion for Default Judgment. A default judgment will be entered in favor of plaintiff, PNCEF, LLC, and against defendants, Hendricks Building Supply, LLC and Hendricks Companies, Inc., jointly and severally, in the total amount of $132,529.48. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/8/10. (tgw)
September 10, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 20 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Hendricks Building Supply, LLC and Hendricks Companies, Inc. Plaintiff is ordered, on or before 9/29/10, to file a supplemental evidentiary submission consisting of detailed documentation to establish its claimed money damages against defendants. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/10/10. (mbp)
April 29, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 11 Response to Order to Show Cause stating the Court extends the time for service under Rule 4(m) for a period of 60 days from its original setting. The deadline for plaintiff to perfect service of process on defendants is hereby extended through and including June 7, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/29/10. Copies to parties on 4/30/10. (mpp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNCEF, LLC v. Hendricks Building Supply, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNCEF, LLC
Represented By: John William Clark, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hendricks Building Supply, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hendricks Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?