Guarantee Company North America, USA v. Gadcon, Inc.

Plaintiff: Guarantee Company North America, USA
Defendant: Gadcon, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00813
Filed: December 15, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Guarantee Company North America, USA against Gadcon, Inc., in the total amount of $134,438.36. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/28/10. Copies to parties. (mpp)
April 2, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Against Defendant Gadcon stating the plaintiff is ordered by 4/30/10 to file an evidentiary submission consisting of detailed documentation to establish its money damages against defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/2/10. Copies to parties. (mpp)
January 6, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The defendant is preliminarily enjoined and restrained from making or attempting to make any transfers or conveyances of defendant's assets, and from selling, convey ing, mortgaging, encumbering or in any other substantive manner dealing with any of defendant's assets or property, pending trial on the merits in this case. The security previously posted by the plaintiff in the amount of $500 will continue to be held by the Clerk. Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to serve a copy of this Order on defendant in a manner calculated to alert defendant immediately to entry of same. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 1/6/10. (tgw)
December 23, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's application for temporary restraining order as more further set out in order. Plaintiff is ordered to post a bond in the amount of $500.00 by 12/28/09. This Order shall be deemed effec tive upon plaintiff's positing of the bond and will expire at the close of business on 1/6/10, unless extended for good cause shown pursuant to Rule 65(b)(2). Any party wishing to be heard in opposition to plaintiff's Request for Preliminar y Injunction must file a brief by 12/31/09. Plaintiff is allowed until 1/4/10 to file a reply. Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to serve a copy of this Order on defendant in a manner calculated to alert defendant immediately to same. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 12/23/09. (mbp)
December 16, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Setting Motion Deadlines re: MOTION 1 for Temporary Restraining Order & for Preliminary Injunction filed by Guarantee Company North America, USA stating Plaintiff's Notice due by 12/18/2009 as set out & Defendant's Brief due by 12/21/2009. Motion to be taken under submission after 12/21/2009. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 12/16/09. Copies to parties.(mpp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guarantee Company North America, USA v. Gadcon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guarantee Company North America, USA
Represented By: L. Graves Stiff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gadcon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?