Jones v. Culliver et al
Plaintiff: Anthony N. Jones
Defendant: Grantt Culliver, Doctor Barnes, Donny Myers and Dr. Temssa
Case Number: 1:2009cv00835
Filed: December 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Presiding Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 JUDGMENT that Plf's Complaint be DISMISSED w/prejudice. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/25/2011. (copy mailed to Plf on 10/25/11) (tot)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADOPTING 55 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Plaintiff's 49 MOTION for Permission to Appeal in forma pauperis be DENIED. AND 49 DENYING MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/18/10. (Copy to Appellant and e-mailed to USCA). (jal)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Plaintiff's 49 MOTION for Permission to Appeal in forma pauperis be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 11/12/2010. (Copy to Pltf & 11th CCA) (mab) Modified on 11/12/2010 (mab).
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plf's 30 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, or in the Alternative, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/23/10. (copy mailed to Plf on 8/24/10) (tot)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Culliver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony N. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grantt Culliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Temssa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?