Loxley South, LLC v. Western Express, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Loxley South, LLC
Defendant: Western Express, Inc., Wayne W. Wise, Donna Wise and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00024
Filed: January 12, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 106 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/5/2011. (sdb)
June 21, 2011 105 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - In accordance with the order entered May 10, 2011 (doc. 98 ) and the order entered herewith, judgment is hereby entered in favor of defendant Western Express, Inc. and against plaintiff Loxley South, L.L.C. on the plaintiff's claims and judgment is hereby entered in favor of plaintiff Loxley South, L.L.C. and against defendant Western Express, Inc., on the defendant's counterclaims. It is ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/21/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
May 10, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 69 Western's Motion for Summary Judgment on Loxley South's claims of breach of contract, declaratory relief and specific performance; granting 74 Loxley South's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Western's claim of fraud; finding as moot 92 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 94 Motion to Strike. Oral argument is set 5/26/11 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 5A on the issue that Western seeks to recover all sums paid for the property, paid to prepare to construct the road and transfer property back to Loxley South. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/10/2011. (srr)
May 19, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Donna Wise, Wayne W. Wise, recommending that defendants' motion to dismiss be granted without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/19/2010. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loxley South, LLC v. Western Express, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loxley South, LLC
Represented By: Allan R. Chason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Express, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Anne Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne W. Wise
Represented By: Sara Anne Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Wise
Represented By: Sara Anne Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Sara Anne Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?