Saenzpardo v. United Framing Construction Company et al

Plaintiff: Steve Saenzpardo
Defendant: United Framing Construction Company and Matthew David Nero
Case Number: 1:2010cv00049
Filed: January 27, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2012 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 157 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/18/2012. (mab)
December 2, 2011 152 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of United Framing Construction, Inc. and, Matthew David Nero against Steve Saenzpardo. Costs are to be taxed against the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/2/2011. (mab)
October 31, 2011 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, plaintiff's 113 motion to alter or amend summary judgment pursuant to Rule 59(e) is DENIED, as are his requests to have the summary judgment order vacated, to hold a hearing on spoliation and discovery issues, and to modify the summary judgment order to a final judgment per Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). Joint motion to stay proceedings is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/31/2011. (mab)
October 21, 2011 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by United Framing Construction Company, Inc.; construing plaintiff's 103 Motion for Leave to File a motion to strike to be a motion to strike, and granting the motion to strike.Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/21/2011. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saenzpardo v. United Framing Construction Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Saenzpardo
Represented By: Troy Thomas Schwant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Framing Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew David Nero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?