MC-UA Local 119 Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Air Comfort Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: MC-UA Local 119 Health and Welfare Fund, James B. Donaghey, William Morrison, Harry J. Chaney, Robert Clapper, Edward Sewell, MC-UA Local 119 Pension Plan, William E. Chaney, Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, James Downey and United Association of Journeyman and Apprentices of the United States and Canada, Local 119
Defendant: Air Comfort Company, Inc. and Stanley Small
Case Number: 1:2010cv00119
Filed: March 11, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2012 139 Opinion or Order of the Court Order that Plaintiffs January 14, 2011 filing of the certificate of judgment constitutes a judicial lien with priority over the claims asserted by Climatic Comfort, Whitney Bank and/or Wittichen Supply, such that Plaintiffs have a superior claim to the GCCF money as to these claimants.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/26/12. (cmj)
January 10, 2012 133 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for plaintiffs to reply to each of the claimant's responses, as set out, setting forth all those reasons why they, rather than said claimants are entitled to the monies deposited with the Court. ( Responses due by 1/24/2012). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/10/2012. (cmj)
November 1, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of the Plaintiffs and against Defendant Air Comfort Co., Inc., in the amount of $5,828.75, which shall resolve the motion (Doc. 99 ). This judgment shall not in any way alter or affect the Plaintiffs' right to enf orce the Court's December 7, 2010, Judgment against the Defendants (Doc. 26 ). It is also ORDERED that the motion (Doc. 99 ) is DISMISSED against Stanley E. Small, E.J. Saad, and Russell S. Terry. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/1/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
July 15, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 78 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt. Contempt Hearing set for 7/25/2011 at 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/15/2011. copies to parties & emailed to CRD. (sdb)
April 11, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 Motion to Stay as to defendant Air Comfort, having filed bankruptcy protection. This stay does not effect Plaintiff's claims against defendant, Stanley Small. Plaintiffs to provide a status report on or before 8/11/11. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/11/2011. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MC-UA Local 119 Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Air Comfort Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MC-UA Local 119 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: J. Cecil Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B. Donaghey
Represented By: J. Cecil Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Morrison
Represented By: J. Cecil Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry J. Chaney
Represented By: J. Cecil Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Clapper
Represented By: J. Cecil Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Sewell
Represented By: J. Cecil Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MC-UA Local 119 Pension Plan
Represented By: J. Cecil Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E. Chaney
Represented By: J. Cecil Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund
Represented By: J. Cecil Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Downey
Represented By: J. Cecil Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Association of Journeyman and Apprentices of the United States and Canada, Local 119
Represented By: J. Cecil Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Comfort Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?