Love v. City Of Mobile et al

Plaintiff: Antonio Love
Defendant: City Of Mobile, Kevin Rodgers, Dollar General Corporation, Kenneth Gooden and White-Spunner & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00166
Filed: April 7, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2011 156 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT entered in favor of City Of Mobile, Kevin Rodgers, Officer Bryan Mims, Officer Carlos Walton, Officer Clay Godwin, Officer Harry Milbrath, Officer Joe Cotner against Antonio Love. Plaintiff's claims against said defendants DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Cost of aforementioned defendants are to be taxed against the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/29/2011. (mab)
August 9, 2011 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 151 Joint Motion to Dismiss Dfts. Plf's claims against Dfts Dollar General Corporation & Kenneth Gooden are DISMISSED w/prejudice as set out. Each party to bear his/its own costs. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/9/2011. (tot)
December 8, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 77 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Plf's claims against Dfts Officer David Fenner & Officer Albert Priselac are DISMISSED w/o prejudice as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/8/10. (tot)
July 8, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plf's claims against Gooden for negligent or wanton failure to properly train managers & employees is DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE. The 16 MOTION to Dismiss is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/8/10. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love v. City Of Mobile et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Love
Represented By: Thomas Earl James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Mobile
Represented By: Thomas O. Gaillard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Rodgers
Represented By: James B. Rossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General Corporation
Represented By: Caroline Thomason Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Gooden
Represented By: Caroline Thomason Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White-Spunner & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Emit Luther McCafferty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?