Finger v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Van P. Finger
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv00192
Filed: April 27, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2012 86 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered that the claims of Plaintiff, Van P. Finger against Defendant State Farm are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/3/2012. (cmj)
July 28, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Motion to Stay as set out. Defendants supersedeas bond is APPROVED and that Defendants Motion to Stay (Doc. 71) isGRANTED. Further, Defendant is ORDERED to deposit the original supersedeas bond withthe Clerk of Court on or before August 1, 2011.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/28/2011. (cmj)
July 5, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered that in accordance with the Order entered May 19, 2011, granting Plaintiff Van P. Fingers motion for partial summary judgment (Doc. 53) and the Order issued contemporaneously herewith, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Plaintiff Van P. Finger and against Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company in the amount of $785,311.33, plus prejudgment interest at 6% per annum on $400,000 accruing from December 14 , 2009, through June 14, 2010, prejudgment interest at 6% per annum on $785,311.33 accruing from June 15, 2010, until the date of this judgment, and post judgment interest pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/5/2011. (mca)
June 28, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/28/2011. (sdb)
May 19, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered that for the reasons set forth, it is ORDERED that Fingers motion for partial summary judgment (Doc. 38) is GRANTED and that State Farms motion for summary judgment (Doc. 42) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/19/2011. (mca)
August 19, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Plaintiff's 3 Motion to Remand is DENIED and Defendant's 8 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Notice of Removal is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its Amended Notice of Removal by 8/31/10. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/19/10. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finger v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van P. Finger
Represented By: Cooper C. Thurber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Angela Taylor Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?