McIntyre v. Aurora Cares, LLC. et al

Plaintiff: Carol McIntyre
Defendant: Tara Cares, Inc. and Mobile Nursing and Rehabilitation Center
Case Number: 1:2010cv00208
Filed: April 30, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: Disability Act of 1990
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/26/2011. (cmj)
September 22, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part and denying in part 57 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Motion to Reinstate and Enforce Mediation Agreement filed by Carol McIntyre. The 57 Motion is GRANTED as to the motion to reinstate and DENIED as to the motion to enforce mediation agreement. Granting 58 MOTION to Supplement Notice of Supplemental Filing filed by Carol McIntyre. Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2011 at 12:00 Noon in US Courthouse, Judge's Chambers, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile , AL 36602 before Judge Kristi K. DuBose. Joint Pretrial Document due by Noon on 9/27/2011. Jury Selection set for 10/4/2011 at 08:45AM and for trial during the month of October, 2011, in Mobile, Alabama. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/22/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
August 17, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 54 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Trial Settings and Pre-Trial Deadlines filed by Mobile Nursing and Rehabilitation Center. Pretrial Conference reset for 9/22/2011 at Noon in US Courthouse, Judge's Chambers, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Judge Kristi K. DuBose. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/17/2011. copies to parties (sdb)
July 21, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 35 MOTION to Dismiss Harassment Claim and Supporting Brief filed by Mobile Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, recommending this motion be denied as set out. Objections to R&R due by 8/4/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/21/2011. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McIntyre v. Aurora Cares, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol McIntyre
Represented By: John T. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Cares, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Nursing and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?