Cotton Bayou Marina, Inc. v. BP, PLC et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Cotton Bayou Marina, Inc.
Defendant: BP, PLC, BP Products North America, Inc., BP America, Inc., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. and Cameron International Corporation
Case Number: 1:2010cv00243
Filed: May 7, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2010 70 Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Eastern District of Louisiana requesting transfer of action. Complaint, Docket Sheet & Transfer Order sent to requesting district (tgw)
August 23, 2010 69 Featured Case ORDER granting 54 Motion to Stay pending a decision from the MDL Panel as to whether this case will be transferred to the Eastern District of Louisiana. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/23/10. (tgw)
August 20, 2010 68 REPLY to Response to Motion 54 Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Errata D) (Buffkin, Russell)
August 10, 2010 67 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BP, PLC re: 66 Reply Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to BP Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to BP Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to BP Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss) (Gray, Marchello)
August 9, 2010 66 REPLY Brief filed by Defendants BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BP, PLC re: 63 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BP, PLC. (Gray, Marchello)
August 4, 2010 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re 54 MOTION to Stay Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.'s Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Cotton Bayou Marina, Inc.. (Stratton, Richard)
August 3, 2010 64 RESPONSE in Opposition re 52 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively MOTION for More Definite Statement, 50 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Cotton Bayou Marina, Inc.. (Stratton, Richard)
July 30, 2010 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re 55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Response and Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Cotton Bayou Marina, Inc.. (Stratton, Richard)
July 30, 2010 62 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on BP, plc on 7-05-10, filed by Cotton Bayou Marina, Inc.. (Stratton, Richard)
July 26, 2010 61 Joinder in MOTION re 55 MOTION to Dismiss. (Brooks, William)
July 22, 2010 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Douglas Stratton on behalf of Cotton Bayou Marina, Inc. (Stratton, Richard)
July 21, 2010 59 NOTICE by BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc. re 57 MOTION for Bloom to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-955232, Online Credit Card Payment.) (REPLACEMENT EXHIBITS) (Brooks, William) Modified on 7/21/2010 (tgw).
July 12, 2010 58 Featured Case ORDER granting 57 Motion for Wendy L Bloom to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/12/10. copies to parties. (sdb)
July 9, 2010 57 MOTION for Bloom to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-955232, Online Credit Card Payment.) by BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Application, # 2 Exhibit Certificate Good Standing) (Brooks, William)
July 6, 2010 56 Brief filed by BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc. re 55 MOTION to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10) (Brooks, William)
July 6, 2010 55 MOTION to Dismiss by BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc.. (Brooks, William)
July 6, 2010 54 MOTION to Stay Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D) (Leach, John)
July 6, 2010 53 Brief filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. re 52 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively MOTION for More Definite Statement. (Leach, John) (Main Document 53 replaced on 7/7/2010) (tgw).
July 6, 2010 52 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Leach, John)
July 6, 2010 51 Brief filed by Cameron International Corporation re 50 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cameron International Corporation. (Frazer, Albert)
July 6, 2010 50 MOTION to Dismiss by Cameron International Corporation. (Frazer, Albert)
July 5, 2010 49 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady and is now assigned to the docket of Chief Judge William H. Steele. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-C after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
June 28, 2010 48 Featured Case ORDER granting 46 Motion for Floyd Hartley, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 47 Motion for Gavin Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 6/28/10. (srr)
June 26, 2010 47 MOTION for Gavin E. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-949091, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Leach, John)
June 26, 2010 46 MOTION for Floyd R. Hartley, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-949090, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Leach, John)
June 16, 2010 45 Featured Case ORDER entered re 42 43 and 44 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Upon a review of the motions, it is hereby ORDERED, adjudged and decreed that counselors Richard C. Godfrey, John T. Hickey, Jr., and J. Andrew Langan, as members in good standing of the Bar of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois, who have complied with the rules of this Court, be and are hereby admitted pro hac vice to serve the interests of justice in the above-entitled cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 6/16/10. (eec)
June 16, 2010 44 MOTION for J. Andrew Langan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-943230, Online Credit Card Payment.) by BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhbit B) (Brooks, William)
June 16, 2010 43 MOTION for John T. Hickey, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-943228, Online Credit Card Payment.) by BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Brooks, William)
June 16, 2010 42 MOTION for Richard C. Godfrey to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-943219, Online Credit Card Payment.) by BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Brooks, William)
June 14, 2010 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Brantley Fry on behalf of Cotton Bayou Marina, Inc. (Fry, Anna)
June 7, 2010 40 Featured Case ORDER on 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 6/7/10. (eec)
June 5, 2010 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc.. (Brooks, William)
June 2, 2010 38 Featured Case ORDER entered re 7 Motion to Stay. The motion to stay proceedings is DENIED without prejudice to the defendants' ability to re-file same after responsive pleadings have been filed. See, e.g., Hopkins, et al. v. Transocean, Ltd., et al., CA 10-0221-WS-C, Doc. 12 (May 25, 2010 order denying motion to stay as premature). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 6/2/10. (eec)
June 1, 2010 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re 7 MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint, filed by Cotton Bayou Marina, Inc.. (Tomlinson, John)
June 1, 2010 36 REPLY to Response to Motion 7 Halliburton Energy's Services, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Stay filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhs A-H, # 2 Exhibit Exhs I-V) (Leach, John)
June 1, 2010 35 ALIAS Summons Issued as to BP, PLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec)
May 28, 2010 34 Featured Case ORDER granting 32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by David Beck for defendant Cameron International Corporation; Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/28/10. (mjn)
May 28, 2010 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Marchello Dewaun Gray on behalf of BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc. (Gray, Marchello)
May 28, 2010 32 MOTION for David J. Beck to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-935048, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Cameron International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Mullican, Robert)
May 27, 2010 31 Order re: 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cotton Bayou Marina, Inc. that there are no potential conflicts of interest; Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/27/10. (mjn)
May 27, 2010 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Cotton Bayou Marina, Inc.. (Tomlinson, John)
May 26, 2010 Answer due from Cameron International Corporation on 7/6/2010. (eec)
May 26, 2010 29 Featured Case ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Cameron International Corporation is ORDERED to answer the plaintiffs' complaint, or otherwise respond/move, not later than July 6, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/26/10. (eec)
May 26, 2010 28 Featured Case ORDER on 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cameron International Corporation. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/26/10. (eec)
May 26, 2010 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Frazer, Albert)
May 26, 2010 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to Respond to the Complaint by Cameron International Corporation. (Mullican, Robert)
May 25, 2010 25 Featured Case ORDER entered re: 21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; 22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; 23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED, adjudged and decreed that counselors Donald E. Godwin, Bruce W. Bowman, Jr., Jenny L. Martinez, and Robert Alan York, as members in good standing of the Bar of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, who have complied with the rules of this Court, be and are hereby admitted pro hac vice to serve the interests of justice in this cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/25/10. (eec)
May 25, 2010 24 MOTION for Robert Alan York to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-932704, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Babington, Joseph)
May 25, 2010 23 MOTION for Jenny L. Martinez to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-932700, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Babington, Joseph)
May 25, 2010 22 MOTION for Bruce W. Bowman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-932699, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Babington, Joseph)
May 25, 2010 21 MOTION for Donald E. Godwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-932698, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Babington, Joseph)
May 24, 2010 20 Featured Case ORDER on 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/24/10. (eec)
May 21, 2010 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Halliburton Company identifying Corporate Parent Halliburton Company for Halliburton Energy Services, Inc... (Leach, John)
May 21, 2010 18 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Cotton Bayou Marina, Inc. Alias Summons as to BP, plc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CT Corporation letter refusing service) (Tomlinson, John)
May 20, 2010 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cotton Bayou Marina, Inc.. BP, PLC served on 5/17/2010, answer due 7/6/2010. (Tomlinson, John)
May 20, 2010 16 Featured Case ORDER entered. This Court, in its discretion, hereby GRANTS the motions filed by the BP defendants and Halliburton (Docs. 12 & 15) and ORDERS the movants to answer the plaintiffs' complaint, or otherwise respond/move, not later than July 6, 2010. Answers due 7/6/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/20/10. (eec)
May 19, 2010 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Babington, Joseph)
May 19, 2010 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants BP America, Inc. and BP Products North America, Inc.'s Motion for Enlargment of Time filed by Cotton Bayou Marina, Inc.. (Jones, Rhon)
May 18, 2010 13 Joinder in MOTION re 7 MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint,. (Brooks, William)
May 18, 2010 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc.. (Brooks, William)
May 18, 2010 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cotton Bayou Marina, Inc.. BP America, Inc. served on 5/13/2010, answer due 6/3/2010; BP Products North America, Inc. served on 5/13/2010, answer due 6/3/2010; Cameron International Corporation served on 5/13/2010, answer due 6/3/2010; Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. served on 5/13/2010, answer due 6/3/2010. (Tomlinson, John)
May 18, 2010 10 Featured Case Order re: 7 MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint, filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., This motion will be taken under submission by the undersigned, without oral argument, on June 2, 2010. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file their response to the motion for stay on or before June 1, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/18/10. (eec)
May 18, 2010 9 Featured Case ORDER on 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/18/10. (eec) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/18/2010) (eec).
May 17, 2010 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Halliburton Company identifying Corporate Parent Halliburton Company for Halliburton Energy Services, Inc... (Leach, John)
May 17, 2010 7 MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint, by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G) (Leach, John)
May 17, 2010 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Crandle Buffkin on behalf of Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Buffkin, Russell)
May 17, 2010 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. H. Babington on behalf of Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Babington, Joseph)
May 10, 2010 Remark: Summons mailed to counsel for service. (eec)
May 10, 2010 4 Summons Issued as to BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BP, PLC, Cameron International Corporation, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (eec)
May 10, 2010 3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
May 7, 2010 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Cotton Bayou Marina, Inc. (Beasley, Jere)
May 7, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against BP America, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., BP, PLC, Cameron International Corporation, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 1128-925632, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Cotton Bayou Marina, Inc.. (Beasley, Jere) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2010: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eec).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cotton Bayou Marina, Inc. v. BP, PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cotton Bayou Marina, Inc.
Represented By: Jere L. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?