Crawford v. Dolgen Corp. Inc.

Plaintiff: Ashley Crawford
Defendant: Dolgen Corp. Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00256
Filed: May 17, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Monroe
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 67 Motion in Limine as further set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/23/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
May 4, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendant's 40 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying in part and mooting in part 51 Motion to Strike, as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/4/2011. (cmj)
September 30, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying 6 & 20 MOTIONS to Dismiss filed by Dolgen Corp. Inc.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/30/2010. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Dolgen Corp. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Crawford
Represented By: H. Wallace Blizzard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgen Corp. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?