Lindsey v. Board of School Commissioners of Mobile County

Plaintiff: Stephanie R. Lindsey
Defendant: Board of School Commissioners of Mobile County
Case Number: 1:2010cv00285
Filed: June 4, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000rt Job Discrimination/Retaliation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing this action with prejudice, in favor of Board of School Commissioners of Mobile County against Stephanie R. Lindsey. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/29/2011. (cmj)
October 26, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendant Board of School Commissioners of Mobile County, Alabama as to plaintiff's claims brought pursuant to the Equal Pay Act. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/26/2011. (cmj)
September 16, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 31 Position Regarding Mediation filed by Board of School Commissioners of Mobile County. The parties are ORDERED to file supplemental assessments no later than seven (7) days after the Court issues any order(s) regarding summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/16/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsey v. Board of School Commissioners of Mobile County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie R. Lindsey
Represented By: Mary E. Pilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of School Commissioners of Mobile County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?