Branch Banking and Trust Company v. Broaderip

Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Defendant: W.K. Brent Broaderip
Case Number: 1:2010cv00289
Filed: June 9, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff Branch Banking and Trust Co. and against Defendant W.K. Broaderip, such that the Plaintiff is entitled to a total award of $2,257,918.70 from said defendant (consisting of damages in the amount of $2,149,430.32 and attorneys' fees and costs/expenses in the amount of $108,488.38). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/14/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
November 11, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/10/2011. (gcp)
August 11, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 41) is GRANTED in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant Broaderip as to liability and damages as further set out. The 53 MOTION to Strike filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company is MOOT. Plaintiff is GRANTED LEAVE to file an amended motion for attorney's fees and costs, by 8/25/2011. Any response should be filed by 9/8/2011. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/11/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
July 7, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Order setting Settlement Conference for 8/9/2011 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady as further set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/7/2011. copies to parties and emailed to CRD. (sdb)
October 8, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by W.K. Brent Broaderip that the motion be denied as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/7/2010. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch Banking and Trust Company v. Broaderip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: Bess M. Parrish Creswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.K. Brent Broaderip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?