Lelise v. Cumulus Media, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Daphne Lelise
Defendant: Cumulus Media, Inc., Cumulus Broadcasting, LLC and Johnny Coleman
Case Number: 1:2010cv00309
Filed: June 17, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in accordance with the Order entered on August 30, 2011 granting the Cumulus Defendants' 43 motion for summary judgment, denying Plaintiff Leslie's 39 motion for summary judgment as to all claims against the Cumulus Defendants, and mooting Plaintiff Leslie's 39 motion for summary judgment as to the state law claims against Defendant Coleman. It is ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/8/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
August 31, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Leslie's 39 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding her negligent hiring, training and/or supervision claim against the Cumulus' defendants. Leslie's claims for invasion of privacy and intentional infliction of e motional distress against Coleman are DISMISSED without prejudice such that Leslie's motion for summary judgment on said claims is MOOT; granting Cumulus defendants' 43 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Leslie's Title VII sexual hara ssment/hostile work environment claim, FMLA retaliation claim and ADA wrongful termination claim, as well as to Leslie's negligent hiring, training and/or supervision claim; finding as moot 54 Motion to Strike ; sustained in part and overruled in part 60 Objections all as set out in order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/30/2011. (cmj)
May 16, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Daphne Leslie. Discovery cutoff reset to 5/25/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/13/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lelise v. Cumulus Media, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daphne Lelise
Represented By: Toni Jacqueline Horace Braxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumulus Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumulus Broadcasting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?