Vision Bank v. Harless Development Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Vision Bank
Defendant: Harless Development Company, Inc., Douglas J. Harless and Paula H. Harless
Case Number: 1:2010cv00332
Filed: June 28, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court Order directing Clerk to place this matter on the court's administrative docket as set out. Plf should notify the court within 30 days of the resolution of bankruptcy proceedings, or of a lift of stay, at which time this action will be reinstated to the court's active docket. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/28/2011. (tot)
August 25, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Vision Bank's 72 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, and dismissing all of defendants' counterclaims. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/25/2011. (mab)
August 5, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 28 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying defendants' 53 Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting SE Property Holding, L.L.C.'s 61 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/5/2011. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vision Bank v. Harless Development Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vision Bank
Represented By: Frederick George Helmsing, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harless Development Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas J. Harless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula H. Harless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?