Blackwell v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp.

Plaintiff: Emma Carey Blackwell
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00378
Filed: July 19, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Renewed Motion to Dismiss. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/12/2011. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
December 13, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Reconsideration of District Judge Order. The Court's order dismissing this action is superseded, and the action is reinstated. The original complaint and amended complaint, (Docs. 1, 14), shall be construed together as comprising the complaint. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/13/10. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
October 18, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Stryker Howmedica Osteonics Corp. It appears that a more carefully drafted complaint might state a claim. Accordingly, the plf is given leave to file and serve, by 11/2/10, an amended complaint satisfying Rule 8(a)(2), failing which the Court will dismiss her case. Disposition Deadline set to 11/2/2010. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/18/10. copies mailed. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackwell v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Carey Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Represented By: John W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?