AK Steel Corporation v. Earley et al

Plaintiff: AK Steel Corporation
Defendant: Donald Earley, Dona Ashby and Jonathan Salisbury
Case Number: 1:2010cv00415
Filed: August 3, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that the claims of Plaintiff AK Steel Corporation against Defendants Donald Earley, Dona Ashby, and Jonathan Salisbury are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/16/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
August 19, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant Salisburys motion for summary judgment (Doc. 29) is GRANTED as to Counts 1, 2, and 3. Defendants Earley and Ashbys motions for summary judgment (Doc. 29) are GRA NTED as to Counts 2 and 3 but DENIED as to Count 1. Defendants motion for summary judgment (Doc. 29) is CARRIED TO TRIAL as to Count 4. The parties shall file file briefs, as set out, no later than 9/1/11. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/19/2011. (cmj)
August 8, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Briefs concerning which state's law applies to and/or governs the non-contract claims in this case due by 8/15/2011. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/8/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 14, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER granting the oral request of the parties "to address outstanding discovery issues and to request a revision to the remaining deadlines for the case schedule." Discovery cutoff 5/1/2011. Motions due by 6/1/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/14/2011. Copies to parties (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AK Steel Corporation v. Earley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AK Steel Corporation
Represented By: Justin D Flamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Earley
Represented By: Thomas M.L. Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dona Ashby
Represented By: Thomas M.L. Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Salisbury
Represented By: Thomas M.L. Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?