Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Centerline, Inc.

Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Centerline, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00440
Filed: August 11, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plf's 15 Motion for Attorney Fees & Expenses as set out. Plf Wells Fargo Bank is awarded $50,966.17 against Dfts A. Green & W. Green as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/9/2011. (copies mailed to Dfts A. Green & W. Green on 11/10/11) (tot) Modified on 11/10/2011 (tot).
November 16, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. against Angela M. Green, William P. Green in the amount of $2,473,386.36 as set out. Costs to be taxed against Dfts Angela M. Green & William P. Green. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/16/10. (copies mailed to Dfts A. Green & W. Green on 11/17/10) (tot)
October 13, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE as to Centerline, Inc. This case is placed on the administrative docket as set out. Plf is to notify the court w/i 30 days of the resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings or lift of stay as to Centerline, Inc., as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/13/10. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Centerline, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kimberly Paige Janney Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerline, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?