Shropshire v. Toney et al

Plaintiff: Donnie Shropshire
Defendant: Deborah Toney and Chandra Johnson
Case Number: 1:2010cv00470
Filed: August 26, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Butler
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2015 107 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT. In accordance with the Court's order dated November 10, 2014, granting summary judgment in favor of Defendant Deborah Toney and partial summary judgment in favor of Defendant Chandra Johnson: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff recove r nothing on his claim based on deliberate indifference to serious medical needs and that this claim be dismissed on the merits. On January 12, 2015, this action came before the Court for a trial without a jury on Plaintiff's remaining claim aga inst Defendant Chandra Johnson and the following decision was reached: It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff, Donnie Shropshire, recover of the Defendant, Chandra Johnson the amount of $2,000, along with costs. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 1/21/2015. copies to parties. (sdb)
November 17, 2014 101 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re: 96 ORDER adopting 92 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 11/17/2014. copies to parties. (sdb)
November 10, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 92 Report and Recommendation. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Doc. 83 ) is, therefore, DENIED as to Shropshire's excessive force claim against Defendant Johnson, and GRANTED as to Shropshire's claim against both Defendants for deliberate indifference to serious medical need.; denying 91 Motion for Oral Argument. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr. on 11/10/2014. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 18, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 37 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 39 Motion to Amend Complaint; adopting Report and Recommendations re 41 Report and Recommendation. the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge made under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(l)(B) is ADOPTED as the opinion of this Court. ; and denying in part [] Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 3/18/2013. (adk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shropshire v. Toney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Shropshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Toney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandra Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?